THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:20:04 AM
Kidd, Arthur Dickson Francis
CPSO#:
27680
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
24 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Aug 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
24-Apr-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Arthur D. F. Kidd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1975 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 24 Apr 2023 |