skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/10/21 0:11:58 AM

Daly, Lanval Joseph

CPSO#: 27674

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Beverly Hills Dr
North York ON  M3L1A2
Phone: 6473523233 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lanval J. Daly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Daly ( CPSO# 27674 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Suite 336
Sunnyside West
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6152


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Montserrat

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 15, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 15, 2017, St. Joseph’s Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Lanval Joseph Daly’s elective surgical privileges at St. Joseph’s Health Centre have been suspended, effective December 15, 2017.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Apr 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 27 Apr 2021 Active
 
As from April 27, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lanval Daly in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Daly to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. LANVAL JOSEPH DALY
("Dr. Daly")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
												

A.	PREAMBLE
(1)	In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
(2)	I, Dr. Daly, certificate of registration number 27674, am a member of the College.  
(3)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking dated August 9, 2019 ("the August 2019 Undertaking") following an investigation into my obstetrical and gynecological practice, in which I agreed to restrict my practice and undergo clinical supervision. I further acknowledge that the clinical supervision component of the August 2019 Undertaking never commenced.
(4)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that this Undertaking replaces the August 2019 Undertaking. 
B.	UNDERTAKING
(5)	I, Dr. Daly, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately. 
(6)	Practice Restrictions
(a)	I, Dr. Daly, undertake that I will restrict my practice to the following office-based gynecological procedures:
(i)	Pap smears;
(ii)	Insertion and removal of intrauterine devices (IUDs); 
(iii)	Diaphragm fitting and removal; 
(iv)	Initial investigation of abnormal cytology of vulva and/or vagina or cervix under colposcopic technique with or without biopsy(ies) and/or endocervical curetting;
(v)	Follow-up colposcopy with or without biopsy(ies) and/or endocervical curetting;
(vi)	Excision of cervical and vaginal polyps;
(vii)	Biopsy of vulva with or without fulguration; and
(viii)	Endometrial biopsies.

(b)	I, Dr. Daly, undertake that should I wish to expand the list of office-based gynecological procedures that I may perform, I will provide a minimum of fourteen (14) days' notice to the College of my intent to do so, and any additions to the list of procedures set out in this section will be subject to College approval. 
(c)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that if the College approves any additional office-based gynecological procedures that I may perform, I will be required to execute an addendum to this Undertaking or a new undertaking to reflect these changes. 
(7)	Monitoring 
(a)	I, Dr. Daly, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations a minimum of fourteen (14) days in advance of commencing practice at that location. 
(b)	I, Dr. Daly, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(c)	I, Dr. Daly, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
(d)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(8)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by the College's Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-entering Practice. 
(9)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(10)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(11)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(12)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").
(13)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.
(14)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
(15)	Public Register
(a)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b)	I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Daly's practice is restricted to the following office-based gynecological procedures: 
Pap smears
Insertion and removal of intrauterine devices (IUDs)
Diaphragm fitting and removal
	Initial investigation of abnormal cytology of vulva and/or vagina or cervix under colposcopic technique with or without biopsy(ies) or endocervical curetting
	Follow up colposcopy with or without biopsy(ies) and/or endocervical curetting
Excision of cervical and vaginal polyps
	Biopsy of vulva with or without fulguration
Endometrial biopsies 

D.	CONSENT
(16)	I, Dr. Daly, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 27, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lanval Joseph Daly to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 27, 2021:

Dr. Daly’s practice is restricted to the following office-based gynecological procedures:

Pap smears
Insertion and removal of intrauterine devices (IUDs)
Diaphragm fitting and removal
Initial investigation of abnormal cytology of vulva and/or vagina or cervix under colposcopic technique with or without biopsy(ies) or endocervical curetting
Follow up colposcopy with or without biopsy(ies) and/or endocervical curetting
Excision of cervical and vaginal polyps
Biopsy of vulva with or without fulguration
Endometrial biopsies

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On March 15, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Daly.