THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:34:24 PM
McCann, William Gerald
CPSO#:
27655
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. W.G. McCann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 26 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge, Ontario
P1L 2E4
Canada
Date Received: 03 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2020 |