THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:08:12 AM
Robinette, Michael Allan
CPSO#:
27639
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. M.A.Robinette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto, ON M5G 2C4
Date Received: 10 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:08 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jun 2019 |