THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:24:41 AM
Kaul, William Henry
CPSO#:
27631
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Tom Kaul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical records can call House of Hearing at (905) 832-9095.
Date Received: 15 Mar 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:13 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jul 2020 |