THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 9:51:20 AM
Ansari, Parvez
CPSO#:
27608
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Jiwaji University, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P. Ansari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2013
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. J. Rakem (76600) took over Dr. Ansari's practice, including all charts, created up to the year 2008 in Welland. Patients who would like their records should approach Dr. Rakem.
Dr. Ansari indicated that after 2008 he performed assessments for insurance companies.
Dr. Ansari explained that all the records remained with the respective companies and/or assessment centers.
Dr. Ansari stated that lawyers or patients who wish to obtain copies should forward requests directly to the insurance companies.
Date Received: 24 Jul 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:05 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Jun 2013 |