THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:21:41 AM
Pilon, Louise Marie Marguerite
CPSO#:
27569
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Kennedy, Marie Marguerite Louise (used until: 16 Apr 1986 )
Pilon-Kennedy, Marie Marguerite Louise (used until: 10 May 1978 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Expertise Division
Income Security Programs
140 promenade du Portage
Gatineau QC K1A 0J9
Phone: (819) 654-2794
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOUISE MARIE MARGUERITE PILON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1975 |