THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:54:11 AM
Stuart, Gary Allan
CPSO#:
27458
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:P O Box 1455
Waterdown, ON L0R 2H0
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1974 to 15 Jun 1975
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2014 |