THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:01:53 AM
Walker, James Douglas
CPSO#:
27420
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 May 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Civic Parkdale Clinic
Dermatology Centre, 4th floor
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 761-4774
Fax: (613) 761-5093
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:26 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES DOUGLAS WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Mar 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 1980 |