skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 1:16:45 AM

Haukioja, Ari Heimo Olavi

CPSO#: 27405

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
P O Box 86
Cobourg ON  K9A 4K4
Phone: (905) 372-3323
Fax: (905) 372-3692 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Haukioja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Haukioja ( CPSO# 27405 )

Business Address:
Cobourg Clinic
44 University Avenue East
Cobourg ON  K9A 2G5
Phone Number: (905) 372-3323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 14 Oct 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 14 Oct 2020 Active
 (1 of 2)

As from October 14, 2020, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration 
held by Dr. Ari Heimo Olavi Haukioja in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Haukioja to 
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. ARI HEIMO HAUKIOJA
("Dr. Haukioja")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Haukioja, certificate of registration number 27405, am a member of the College.
  
(3)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that following a Registrar's Investigation that raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine, I underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of my practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about my standard of practice in medical record-keeping.

(4)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that I entered into an Undertaking with the College on July 24, 2015 (the "2015 Undertaking"), that this Undertaking does not replace the 2015 Undertaking, and that I continue to be bound by the terms of the 2015 Undertaking.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(5)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6)	Clinical Supervision 

(a)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors recommended by the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 

(b)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B";

(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;

(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;

(iv)	Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;

(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vi)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations; 

(vii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(viii)	Submit written reports to the College at the conclusion of the Clinical Supervision, or earlier if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor  dated June 21, 2020, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (6)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(h)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (6)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(7)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Medical Record Keeping Workshop, University of Toronto;

(ii)	Review, reflection and discussion with my Clinical Supervisor of the College Policy, Medical Records Documentation; and

(iii)	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(8)	Reassessment of Practice

(a)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (6) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (7) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 

(d)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(9)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Haukioja, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Haukioja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(d)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D", respectively. 

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(10)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(11)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(12)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(13)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(14)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(15)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(16)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a Registrar's Investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Haukioja's standard of practice in family medicine, Dr. Haukioja underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about Dr. Haukioja's standard of practice in medical record-keeping. As a result of the reaassessment:

Dr. Haukioja will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months. 
Dr. Haukioja will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping.
Dr. Haukioja's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months after the period of Clinical Supervision.

(c)	I, Dr. Haukioja, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(17)	I, Dr. Haukioja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18)	I, Dr. Haukioja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19)	I, Dr. Haukioja, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;

(c)	any information relevant to the Reassessment;

(d)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  

(e)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
     
                  
(2 of 2)

As from July 24, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ari Heimo Olavi
Haukioja, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Haukioja 
to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

With the exception of his inpatient hospital practice of labour and
delivery, Dr. Haukioja has voluntarily relinquished his prescribing
privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and
preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from
time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
Narcotic Drugs
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)                         Relinquished

Narcotic Preparations
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)                          Relinquished

Controlled Drugs
(from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
under the Food and Drugs
 Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                                                 Relinquished

Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
(from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
Targeted Substances Regulations made 
under the Controlled Drugs and 
Substances Act., S.C., 1996, S.C.,19)                               Relinquished

All Other Monitored Drugs
(as defined under the Narcotic Safety and                   Relinquished
Awareness Act, S.O., 2010, c. 22)


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ari Heimo Olavi Haukioja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 16, 2019:

Following a Registrar’s Investigation that raised concerns about Dr. Haukioja’s standard of practice in family medicine, Dr. Haukioja underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. As a result of the reaassessment:

Dr. Haukioja will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Haukioja’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.