skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 02/08/21 8:13:14 AM

Harrison, Christine Elaine

CPSO#: 27330

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Billsman, Christine Elaine (used until: 18 Jan 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2021