THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:30:45 AM
Wahby, Allen James
CPSO#:
27315
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 May 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hungarian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto, Ontario, M3J 1Y6
Phone: (416-398-0638). Toll-Free (1-888-563-3732). Website: www.rsrs.com.
Date Received: 13 Oct 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 May 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: January 6, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Allen James Wahby to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 6, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Wahby engaged in professional misconduct. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Wahby will engage in professional education prior to his resignation from the College, which will be effective May 23, 2020.
Download Full Document (PDF)