THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:46:25 AM
Wickramasinghe, Senani Devananda
CPSO#:
27236
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Apr 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhalese
Education: University of Ceylon, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Wickramasinghe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 14 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:05 Mar 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2022 |