skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 5:12:31 AM

Irwin, Samuel Patrick

CPSO#: 27225

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Mar 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 20-Sep-2021

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Edinburgh, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. P. Irwin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014