skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/06/22 21:14:29 PM

Jethalal, Hirendrarai Dharamshee

CPSO#: 27162

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Dec 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 May 2001

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education: University of Natal, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106-2100 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone: 416-289-3221
Fax: 416-2893181 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Jethalal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jethalal ( CPSO# 27162 )

Business Address:
Suite 316
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 289-3221

Business Address:
404-1888 Bayview Ave
Ellesmere Health Clinic
Allergy Dept
106
Toronto ON  M4G 0A7
Phone Number: 416=289-3221

Business Address:
106-2100 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1H 3B7
Phone Number: 4162893221

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 May 2001

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 10 May 2001 Active
             As from May 10, 2001, Dr. Hirendrarai D. Jethalal undertakes to not apply for
            privileges at any hospital in Ontario until after he has given at least two
            months notice to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario of his
            intention to apply for privileges.