skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 3:21:44 AM

Madappuli, Valarian Angelo

CPSO#: 27135

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Nov 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ceylon, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, Ontario
M6B 3Z4

Tel: (416) 781-9083
Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 25 Nov 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:05 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2007