skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 27/06/22 4:28:53 AM

Gordon, Michael

CPSO#: 27132

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 28 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education: University of St. Andrews, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:30 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1974
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Sep 2021