skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 13:46:51 PM

Nadalini, Mary Grace

CPSO#: 27109

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Nov 2020
EXPIRY DATE
06 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education: University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nadalini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

RSRS Canada 
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON  M3J 1Y6
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Nov 2020