THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 5:45:57 AM
Bartlett, John Malcolm
CPSO#:
27066
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
13 Mar 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Oct 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Bartlett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019
Corporation Name: W. Vornberger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:481 London Rd
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Date Received: 29 Mar 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2019 |