THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:47:26 AM
Kessaram, Robert Anoop
CPSO#:
27052
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Oct 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Avenue Medical Center, 221 Brant Avenue, Brantford, ON N3T 3J3
Date Received: 18 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jul 2015 |