THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:57:28 AM
Hutchinson, Vivien
CPSO#:
27002
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Sep 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Sep 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hutchinson, Vivien Bessie (used until: 11 Jun 1991 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Community Care Health Centre
Unit B
108 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON K9V 3L5
Phone: (705) 879-4100
Fax: (705) 324-8411
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vivien Hutchinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIVIEN HUTCHINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUTCHINSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jan 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1974 |