skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/07/20 10:03:02 AM

Swinson, Richard Price

CPSO#: 27001

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St.Joesph's Hospital 50 Charton Ave E Hamilton ON L8P 3B6
Date Received: 03 May 2018


Address: ATTN: Tiffany Johnston Anxiety Treatment and Research Clinic Sr. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton 100 West 5th Street, Level 1, Block B Hamilton, ON L8N 3K7 Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext 34964 Fax: 905-521-6120
Date Received: 14 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018