THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:26:39 PM
Bradwell, Peter John
CPSO#:
26996
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
16 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Sep 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Birmingham, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter John Bradwell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:04 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2016 |