skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 4:51:12 AM

Pritchard, Mary Jane

CPSO#: 26985

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Oct 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leaside Health Centre
795 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4G 4E4
Phone: (416) 424-3145
Fax: (416) 424-2611 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

416 Dundas Street East
416 Community Support for Women
Toronto ON  M5A 2A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-3334
Fax: (416) 424-2611
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY JANE PRITCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRITCHARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1987