skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 29/06/22 0:23:07 AM

Chan, Peter Wing-To

CPSO#: 26966

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Sep 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education: National Taiwan University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2004

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 May 1989
Summary:

In May 1989, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Peter Wing-To Chan guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Chan be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. It was further ruled that Dr. Chan's licence to practice be suspended for a period of one year, but that this suspension would itself be suspended provided that the following conditions were met: he must agree to be evaluated by the McMaster Physician Evaluation Program; he was successfully to complete any course of retraining or instruction that the Program might recommend; he was to file with the Registrar of the College, in a form satisfactory to the Registrar, proof that he had satisfactorily completed the evaluation and any retraining or instruction recommended by the Program within one year of this Order becoming final; he was to consent to the release by the College to the administrators of the Program these reasons for decision together with any other information concerning this case that might assist the administrators of the Program; and he was to be responsible for any fees, costs or other expenses incidental to the evaluation by the Program and the completion of any courses of retraining or instruction that the Program might recommend.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): 15 May 1989