THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:20:04 AM
Grove-White, Charles Dermot
CPSO#:
26951
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
16 Dec 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Dublin, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1974 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 16 Dec 1991 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Dec 1991
Summary:
In December 1991, Dr. Grove-White pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Grove-White guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Grove-White(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): Dec 16, 1991
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 1991
Summary:
In June 1991, Dr. Grove-White pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found him guilty of professional misconduct. The Committee further found Dr. Grove-White guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Grove-White(s licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1992-09-08
Hearing Date(s): 10 Jun 1991