THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:41:03 AM
Tilsworth, Richard Hartson
CPSO#:
26873
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Richard H. Tilsworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:395 Carrie St
Strathroy ON N1G 3J4
Date Received: 14 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2019 |