skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 14:56:03 PM

Newton, Arnold

CPSO#: 26804

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sound Care Medical Centre
Suite 560
1145 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone: (613) 738-2378
Fax: (613) 738-9032 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 560
1145 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-2378
Fax: (613) 738-9032
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 09 Jul 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARNOLD NEWTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2021