THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:41:45 AM
Oliveira, Keith Frank
CPSO#:
26798
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
24 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jul 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Bombay, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:17 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1966 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Dec 2014 |