THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 0:59:19 AM
Trottier, Alain Jean
CPSO#:
26779
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jun 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Feb 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 05 Nov 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 1992 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 1998 |