THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:26:06 PM
Liang, Stephen
CPSO#:
26778
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jul 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jul 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN LIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1974 |