THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:41:19 AM
Wilson, George Andrew Charles
CPSO#:
26621
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jan 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. G. A. Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
HandstheFamilyHelp Network
26 Bill's Drive
Bracebridge, ON P1L 1T1
Telephone: 705-645-3155 or 1-800-668-8555
Website: www.HandstheFamilyHelpnetwork.ca
Date Received: 30 Sep 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2015 |