THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 21:59:32 PM
Thompson, Douglas John
CPSO#:
26605
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Jan 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Douglas Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 25 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical record requests should be submitted to Dr. Christine Ly:
Stratford Family Health Team
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON
N5A 0E6
Phone: 519-271-7172
Fax: 519-271-6760
Note: Paper medical records greater than 15 years have been destroyed.
Date Received: 13 Mar 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1975 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jan 2023 |