THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:52:29 AM
Abunassar, Ramzi Yussif
CPSO#:
26600
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Sep 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Hebrew
Education: University of Ottawa, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ramzi Y. Abunassar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Docudavit Solutions
Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 28 May 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |