skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 30/06/22 6:01:20 AM

Wong, Arnold Kai Yuen

CPSO#: 26586

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jan 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Arnold K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2021
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Records Management Ltd: Unit 13-1 High Meadow Place, Toronto  ON  M9L 0A3   Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 21 May 2021


Instructions/Address:

Medical records location: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should
contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, email to:
[email protected], or send written request by mail to: 1 High
Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Feb 2021


Instructions/Address:

: Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record may contact: Records Management Ltd., 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 21 Jan 2021


Instructions/Address:

Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record may contact: Records Management Ltd., 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 21 Jan 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2021