THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:39:34 PM
Baker, Jeffrey Paul
CPSO#:
26562
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Room 050 - 16th Floor Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5909
Fax: (416) 864-5995
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.P. Baker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 23 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:26 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEFFREY PAUL BAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Sep 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1981 |