THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:39:16 AM
Taylor, Gerald Melvin James
CPSO#:
26536
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1263 Canford Crescent
Mississauga ON L5J 3M9
Phone: (905) 823-3615
Fax: (905) 823-9995
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Gerald M. J. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1975 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2021 |