THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:25:53 PM
Chittal, Shashikant Madhav
CPSO#:
26416
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Apr 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Oct 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Bombay, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Mar 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:21 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1972 to 30 Jun 1972
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2000 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Apr 2004 |