THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:17:14 AM
Padmos, Martin Andrew
CPSO#:
26409
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Apr 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Apr 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
62 Rothwell Dr
Gloucester ON K1J 7G6
Phone: 6137411703
Fax: 6137462021
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:23 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN ANDREW PADMOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PADMOS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 1974 |