skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 6:20:47 AM

Forson, Agatha

CPSO#: 26372

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2018
EXPIRY DATE
12 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Mar 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ghana

Education:National University of Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Agatha Forson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2018