THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:33:48 AM
Whitton, Joel Lloyd
CPSO#:
26278
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Dec 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
22-Jul-2017
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Dec 1973 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 22 Jun 2007 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 21 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Mar 2017 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 May 2007
Summary:
On May 22, 2007, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Joel Lloyd Whitton committed professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar suspend Dr. Whitton's certificate of registration for a period of 30 days commencing June 22, 2007.
2. Dr. Whitton appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Whitton pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within 14 days.
4. The results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 22, 2007
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joel Lloyd Whitton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 17, 2017:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Whitton’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result, Dr. Whitton has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
See PDF for full undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)