THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:52:13 AM
Moore, Terrence Leo
CPSO#:
26195
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Oct 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records location as per above.
St. Michael's Hospital
Medical Records Department
30 Bond St
Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Tel: 416-360-4000
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1965 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jan 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |