skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/22 9:39:44 AM

Molot, John Mark

CPSO#: 26190

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Oct 1973
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Apr 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
32 Crimson Millway
North York ON  M2L 1T6
Phone: 6133270269 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 Apr 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 13 Apr 2022 Active
 As from April 13, 2022, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Donald Kevin Hastings, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hastings to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
I, Dr. Molot, certificate of registration number 26190, am a member of the College.  
I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that that following a public complaint that raised concerns about my conduct during an appointment, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number CAS-126411-W4H6G7 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct in my environmental medicine practice.
I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

UNDERTAKING

I, Dr. Molot, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
Professional Education  
(a)	I, Dr. Molot, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
(i)	Review and reflection of the following policy:            
1.	The College's policy: Maintaining Appropriate Boundaries and Preventing Sexual Abuse
(ii)	PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification.  I, Dr. Molot, will agree to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program
(b)	I, Dr. Molot, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c)	I, Dr. Molot, undertake to complete this requirement by August 1, 2022, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
(d)	I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e)	I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that if any of the program listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
Monitoring 
(f)	I, Dr. Molot, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(g)	I, Dr. Molot, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 
I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").
I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.
I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
Public Register
(h)	I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(i)	I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Molot engaged in professional misconduct in the practice of environmental medicine. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Molot will engage in professional education in maintaining appropriate boundaries and communication, including completion of the PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program.
(j)	I, Dr. Molot, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

CONSENT

I, Dr. Molot, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(k)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(l)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 
(m)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
I, Dr. Molot, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
I, Dr. Molot, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(n)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(o)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  
(p)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 26, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

               

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

 

Source: Member
Active Date: April 13, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Molot to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 13, 2022.



A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Molot engaged in professional misconduct in the practice of environmental medicine. As a result of the investigation:



Dr. Molot will engage in professional education in maintaining appropriate boundaries and communication, including completion of the PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program.