THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:47:22 AM
Downar, Eugene
CPSO#:
26167
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Sep 1973
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Pmcc 3 - 552
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4982
Fax: (416) 595-1811
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EUGENE DOWNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNAR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1967 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jul 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1976 |