THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:56:31 PM
Simpson, Robert Alan
CPSO#:
26093
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Apr 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Sep 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert Alan Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:7193 Middlebrook Road
Flora ON N0B 1S0
Date Received: 31 Mar 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2021 |