skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/08/21 5:35:04 AM

Laine, Roy Edward

CPSO#: 26043

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Jul 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
510 Hogarth Avenue West
P O Box 760
Geraldton ON  P0T 1M0
Phone: (807) 854-0363
Fax: (807) 854-2588 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

Nakina Medical Clinic
204A Thornton Street
P O Box 135
Nakina ON  P0T 2H0
Canada
Phone: (807) 329-5264
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Muskeg Thunder Clinic
General Delivery
Ogoki Post, Ontario, P0T 2L0
Acton ON  P0T 2L0
Canada
Phone: (807) 349-2510
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. E. Laine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Laine ( CPSO# 26043 )

Business Address:
510 Hogarth Avenue West
PO Box 760
Geraldton ON  P0T 1M0
Phone Number: (807) 854-0363

Business Address:
204A Thornton Street
PO Box 135
Nakina ON  P0T 2H0
Phone Number: (807) 329-5264

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 16 Jul 2021 Active
 As from July 13, 2021, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Roy Edward Laine accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Laine to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Laine has voluntarily restricted his practice to outpatient care. For further clarity he has agreed not to provide Emergency Room shift work.