THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:37:04 PM
Gentili, Fred
CPSO#:
26037
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
15 Jan 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
15-Jan-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Fred Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 20 2019
Corporation Name: Massicotte Tymianski Gentili Mohammadzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016
Corporation Name: F. Gentili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 22 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:24 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 15 Jan 2022 |