THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:39:58 AM
Oinonen, Ervin Theodore
CPSO#:
26024
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Aug 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
21-Oct-2016
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Finnish
Education: University of Manitoba, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Oinonen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 21 2010
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:c/o Dr. Tsai 'Tony' Yu
9 Court Street
St. Catharines ON L2R 4R3
Date Received: 18 Nov 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Sep 2016 |