THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:42:46 AM
Chiu, Hak Fai
CPSO#:
25910
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Nov 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:14 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 05 Apr 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 1974 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 01 Apr 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 1984 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2008 |