skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 04/07/22 23:23:52 PM

Ede, Megeri

CPSO#: 25875

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hausa, Igbo

Education: University of Edinburgh, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 2012

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Mar 2005
Summary:

On March 22, 2005 the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Ede committed professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional by encouraging patients to participate in a financial scheme in which he was involved.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1) The Registrar suspend Dr. Ede(s Certificate of Registration for a period of two (2) months, which supension shall be suspended upon Dr. Ede(s successful completion, at his own expense, of the College(s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course on or before June 17, 2005.

2) Dr. Ede appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3) Dr. Ede pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,000.00.

4) The results of this proceeding be included in the register.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 22, 2005

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: September 18, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Ede was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of incompetence and of professional misconduct, namely having engaged in sexual abuse of a patient, having engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, having engaged in conduct unbecoming for a physician, and having failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Ede resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.